WY HB0179 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; amending taxes on the production of electricity; imposing a tax on electricity generated from solar resources; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electricity generation-taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-26 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-21 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 50-10-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |