WY HB0177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring comprehensive instruction in American history, government and civics that includes rigorous study of the primary documents and sources of the nation's history as specified; requiring the school district to make curricular materials available for inspection; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-Understanding federal and state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-17 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2021-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |