WY HB0176 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; limiting release of personally identifiable information, including geographic information of the legal taking of wildlife; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Game and fish-data protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assigned Chapter Number 108 | |
2020-03-13 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0048 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2020-03-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0048 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 60-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |