WY HB0175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; generally modifying provisions of the Wyoming Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act; amending and creating definitions; ensuring consistent usage of terms; amending provisions governing coverage provided by the association, limitations to the coverage and the association's maximum financial responsibilities; amending the powers and duties of the association; amending provisions governing association members' assessments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming insurance guaranty association-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 128
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0070
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0070
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0070
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0070
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback