WY HB0175 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to community colleges and the University of Wyoming; requiring the development of a common transcript system; prescribing duties of the University of Wyoming and the community college commission; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Common college transcripts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2018-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0047 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-22 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |