WY HB0175 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming lottery; amending the definition of operating expenses related to the determination of net proceeds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Determination of lottery proceeds.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Loucks [R] | Rep. Marti Halverson [R] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Robert McKim [R] | Rep. Tom Reeder [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4- | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0175.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0175.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0175.pdf |