WY HB0175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Madden and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Goggles, Miller, Petersen and Semlek M Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Madden and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Goggles, Miller, Petersen and Semlek M Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing a limitation on the assessed valuation of certain property for ad valorem taxation as specified; providing applicability; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Property tax-assessed value.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Dave Bonner [R] | Rep. Jonathan Botten [R] |
Rep. John Patton [R] | Rep. Jim Roscoe [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Madden and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Goggles, Miller, Petersen and Semlek M Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0175.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0175.pdf |