WY HB0174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; authorizing rules to provide for the collection of road killed animals; providing restrictions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game road kill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 34-22- (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1- (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 34-22-4-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 34-22- (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1- (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 34-22-4-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | COW:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-30 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | COW:Rerefer to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-25 | Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 34-22- | |
2017-01-25 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-4-1- | |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |