WY HB0173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to court supervised treatment programs; revising provisions relating to the court supervised treatment program account; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court supervised treatment program account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 132
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0085
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0085
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0085
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0085
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-08SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-04House3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0
2019-02-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-31HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback