WY HB0173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for an increase in tobacco taxes as specified; providing for distribution by continuous appropriation to the department of health as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tobacco tax revisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] |
Sen. Charles Scott [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0- (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0- (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0173.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0173.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0173.pdf |