WY HB0171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the operation of state government; providing an appropriation to restore funding for the operation of state government as specified; specifying reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Executive branch funding restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-11 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-27 | Bill Number Assigned |