WY HB0171 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0055
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0055
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; including liquefied gases and other gases within the definition of gasoline for purposes of fuel taxation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fuel tax-gasoline definition.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dave Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Fred Emerich [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2013-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2013-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA0055 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-21 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |