WY HB0170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone, Nicholas B and Throne Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone, Nicholas B and Throne Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to conservation easements; requiring notification to mineral estate owners of potential conservation easements; providing for nullification of conservation easements for failure to notify; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Conservation easements-notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Charles Childers [R] | Rep. Gerald Gay [R] | Rep. Thomas Lockhart [R] |
Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Frank Peasley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone, Nicholas B and Throne Ayes 2 Nays 7 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0170.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0170.pdf |