WY HB0167 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to coal taxation; reducing the severance tax rate for surface coal as specified; conforming related tax distribution provisions; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Severance tax on coal.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Roy Edwards [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] |
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-04 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |