WY HB0164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-27-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to economic development; creating the Wyoming film production incentive program; authorizing incentives for qualified film productions; authorizing investments in branded entertainment; authorizing matching funds for local film production opportunities; requiring rulemaking; providing for penalties; requiring reports; providing for a transfer of funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming film production incentive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-27-3-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Failed 30-27-3-0-0
2019-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback