WY HB0164 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishment; providing for the presence of a victim's advocate at the time of questioning of sexual assault victims; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sexual assault victim advocate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-02-08 | Motion to Do Pass Failed | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0164.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0164.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0164.htm |