WY HB0163 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - President Signed HEA No. 0088
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - President Signed HEA No. 0088
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating teachers; establishing a loan repayment program; enabling teachers to provide concurrent enrollment instruction; specifying eligibility criteria; prescribing procedures and providing for repayment of loans; providing for program administration by the Wyoming community college commission; granting rulemaking authority; sunsetting the program; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adjunct professor incentives.
Sponsors
Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Patrick Goggles [D] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] |
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0088 |
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0088 |
2013-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA0088 | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-24 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-22 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-22 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2013-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |