WY HB0161 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to banking; requiring a guarantor or co-signer on a loan to sign a disclosure related to rights in property involved in the loan; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Loan disclosures for guarantors and co-signers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-21 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |