WY HB0161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to emergency telephone service; requiring designation of a statewide 911 coordinator; specifying duties of the statewide 911 coordinator; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide 911 coordinator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 178
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0113
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0113
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0113
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0113
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-21SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo}
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback