WY HB0161 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic relations; modifying residency requirements for the granting of a divorce as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Divorce-residency.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. John Hastert [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0078 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0078 |
2017-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0078 |
2017-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0078 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-23 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |