WY HB0161 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hastert Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 1 Nays 29 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hastert Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 1 Nays 29 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; providing for an interstate compact on educational opportunity for military children; facilitating enrollment and placement of children of military families; providing for involvement in an interstate commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Interstate compact on students of military families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hastert Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 1 Nays 29 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (S) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Case Ayes 29 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-14 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Jennings, Landen and Rothfuss Excused: Senator(s) Coe Ayes 4 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-14 | (S04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-07 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 59 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Connolly, Freeman, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Madden and Teeters Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-01 | (H04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0161.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0161.pdf |