WY HB0160 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state treasurer; authorizing the state treasurer to obtain financial and criminal background checks as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Background checks-state treasurer's office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 8 | |
2020-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0006 | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0006 |
2020-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0006 |
2020-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0006 | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-26 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 57-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |