WY HB0160 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vehicle sales and use tax; amending the time for payment of sales and use tax for certain sales of vehicles; conforming interest and fee provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0160.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0160.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0160.htm |