WY HB0159 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the regulation of alcoholic liquor; amending the number of satellite locations for liquor manufacturers; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Liquor manufacturer regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Andrea LeBeau [D] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] |
Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Cyrus Western [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-0-2 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-0-2 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 150 | |
2021-04-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0091 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0091 |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0091 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0091 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Concur:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-0-2 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-04-01 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Refer to S08 - Transportation |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-26 | Bill Number Assigned |