WY HB0159 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 180 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to children; authorizing a minor who is unemancipated and homeless to obtain birth certificates and enter into binding contracts as specified; requiring affidavits; providing that contracts are binding if accepted in good faith reliance on affidavits; specifying that the fact a minor is homeless is not sufficient basis for reporting abuse or neglect; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Adopted HB0159JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Adopted HB0159JC001: 43-17-0-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 29-31-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 180 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0109
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0109
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0109
2017-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0109
2017-03-01SenateAdopted HB0159JC001: 28-1-1-0-0
2017-03-01HouseAdopted HB0159JC001: 43-17-0-0-0
2017-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-27HouseConcur:Failed 29-31-0-0-0
2017-02-24HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0
2017-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-22SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-14SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2017-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0
2017-01-30House3rd Reading:Failed 30-30-0-0-0
2017-01-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-26HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-24HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2017-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback