WY HB0159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the separate statewide writing assessment; eliminating the writing assessment; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-writing assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0050 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0050 |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0050 |
2015-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0050 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-18 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-29 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |