WY HB0158 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; providing for a microbrewery to operate at more than one (1) location; making conforming changes; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Microbreweries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Assigned Chapter Number 132
2020-03-24 Governor Signed HEA No. 0080
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0080
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0080
2020-03-11 Assigned Number HEA No. 0080
2020-03-11HouseConcur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 53-6-1-0-0
2020-03-11SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseConcur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0
2020-03-10HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-05SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-03-03Senate:Rerefer to S01 - Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2020-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-2-1-0-0
2020-02-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback