WY HB0158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicle penalties; removing the imprisonment penalty under the general penalty provisions for motor vehicles, for traffic violations and the Driver's License Act; providing for imprisonment penalties for specified violations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic violations-no imprisonment penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-20SenateS01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-02-14Senate:Rerefer to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-31SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-22HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback