WY HB0158 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Esquibel, F., Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Emerich Ayes 9 Nays 20 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Esquibel, F., Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Emerich Ayes 9 Nays 20 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; providing that only interests in real property must vest as specified; providing that trusts holding property other than interests in real property shall continue as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Rule against perpetuities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Esquibel, F., Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Emerich Ayes 9 Nays 20 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a) | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-11 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Hicks and Perkins Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-11 | (S01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel and Peasley. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Gay, Goggles and Lockhart. Ayes 54 Nays 2 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brechtel, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone and Throne Nayes: Representative(s) Nicholas B and Peasley Ayes 7 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (H01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0158.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0158.pdf |