WY HB0156 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring physicians to provide patients with specified information before certain nonemergency abortion procedures; providing and amending definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion–ultrasound information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0- (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04 H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2015-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback