WY HB0155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to agriculture and livestock; specifying requirements for distribution of meat pursuant to ownership of an animal share; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal shares.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted HB0155JC001: 23-0-6-0-1 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted HB0155JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Failed 5-55-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Assigned Chapter Number 119
2020-03-17 Governor Signed HEA No. 0091
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0091
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0091
2020-03-12 Assigned Number HEA No. 0091
2020-03-11SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseConcur:Failed 5-55-0-0-0
2020-03-10HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-1
2020-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-06SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2020-02-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-20HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 52-5-3-0-0
2020-02-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback