WY HB0154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for recoupment of fees for reduced price licenses for individuals with disabilities as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Complimentary hunting licenses-persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0154JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0154JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0154JC001: 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0154JC001: 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 10-49-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 10-49-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0154JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0154JC001: 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0154JC001: 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 10-49-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 10-49-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0088 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0088 |
2015-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0088 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0088 | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Adopted HB0154JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Adopted HB0154JC001: 55-1-4-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-23 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-23 | House | Concur:Failed 10-49-1-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |