WY HB0153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to courts; authorizing the supreme court to review and eliminate previously created full-time magistrate positions as specified; providing factors for review; requiring consultation with the appropriate board of county commissioners; making a conforming amendment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Review of circuit court magistrate positions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - COW:Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 11-5 Passed 21-23-16 (Y: 21 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - COW:Failed 23-23-14-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseCOW:H Did not consider for COW
2021-03-19HouseCOW:Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 11-5 Passed 21-23-16
2021-03-19HouseCOW:Failed 23-23-14-0-0
2021-03-05HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-05HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-03-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback