WY HB0153 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 188 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to parents; providing for a parental right to the care, custody and control of a child; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-7-3-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-7-3-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-7-3-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 188 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0096
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0096
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0096
2017-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
2017-03-01HouseConcur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2017-02-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-15SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2017-01-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-27House3rd Reading:Passed 50-7-3-0-0
2017-01-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-23HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback