WY HB0151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the taxation and revenue; increasing the cigarette tax rate; amending distribution of the cigarette tax; clarifying distribution of license fees; repealing related provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cigarette tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed 35-24-1-0- (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 35- (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 22-38-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 22-38-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed 35-24-1-0- (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 35- (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 22-38-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 22-38-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed 35-24-1-0- |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 22-38-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |