WY HB0150 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special districts; authorizing the creation of early childhood development special districts; providing for the formation, functions and powers of early childhood development special districts; authorizing the imposition of assessments; making conforming amendments; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Early childhood development special districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Berger [R] | Rep. Andrew Byron [R] | Rep. Liz Storer [D] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] |
Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-03 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |