WY HB0149 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; increasing the percentage of nonresident elk, deer and antelope licenses available through a special drawing; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Special nonresident hunting license draw.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-02 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |