WY HB0148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 202
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to government ethics; requiring elected officials and members of the legislature to disclose information on contracts with the state as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State offices-contract transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 202
2019-03-15 Governor Signed HEA No. 0094
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0094
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0094
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0094
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-22HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback