WY HB0147 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; amending the crime of interference with lawful taking of wildlife; prohibiting acts that restrict access to or use of state or federal land as specified; providing an exception; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Unlawful trespass signage-taking of wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number 40 | |
2023-02-18 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0018 | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0018 |
2023-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0018 |
2023-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0018 | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-09 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-27 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |