WY HB0147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; making permissive the requirement that school districts provide instruction in foreign languages to students in kindergarten through second grade; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-2 foreign language requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-06SenateS04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-31SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0
2019-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback