WY HB0144 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school safety and security; establishing a comprehensive school safety program; requiring establishment of a tip line; requiring training; prohibiting disclosure of information; granting rulemaking authority for program administration; requiring reporting; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education-school safety and security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0144JC001: 28-29-3-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0144JC001: 28-29-3-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 9-48-3-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 9-48-3-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-29-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-29-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-09Housepostponed indefinitely
2015-03-06HouseAppointed JCC02 Members
2015-03-05HouseDid Not Adopt HB0144JC001: 28-29-3-0-0
2015-03-02SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-27HouseConcur:Failed 9-48-3-0-0
2015-02-27HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0
2015-02-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-24SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-24 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2015-02-23SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-02-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-11House3rd Reading:Passed 31-29-0-0-0
2015-02-10House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-09HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-06HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-06 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2015-02-03HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-03HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-03 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2015-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-20HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback