WY HB0143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and sentencing; specifying when a presentence investigation report must be completed for convicted felony defendants; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Presentence investigation reports-judicial discretion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 167 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0097 | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0097 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0097 |
2019-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0097 | |
2019-02-25 | House | Concur:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |