WY HB0142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to wildlife and natural resource funding; authorizing the wildlife and natural resource trust account board to make recommendations as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife and natural resource trust account board-duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 136
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0077
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0077
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0077
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0077
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28House3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
2019-01-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback