WY HB0141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Johnson, Martin, Nutting, Perkins, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Case, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Peterson and Scott. Ayes 13 Nays 17 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Johnson, Martin, Nutting, Perkins, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Case, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Peterson and Scott. Ayes 13 Nays 17 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental immunity; providing a waiver of governmental immunity for damages caused by a violation of whistleblower statutes for medical facilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Governmental immunity-waiver for hospital employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Johnson, Martin, Nutting, Perkins, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Case, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Peterson and Scott. Ayes 13 Nays 17 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (S) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-23 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Burns, Esquibel, F., Hicks and Perkins Nayes: Senator(s) Christensen Ayes 4 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-23 | (S01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harvey, Illoway, Kasperik, Krone, Lockhart, McOmie, Moniz, Patton, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Stubson, Throne, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Berger, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Gay, Harshman, Hunt, Jaggi, Kroeker, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, Miller, Nicholas B, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Teeters, Vranish and Wallis. Ayes 33 Nays 27 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-27 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Nicholas B and Throne Nayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Krone and Peasley Ayes 6 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-27 | (H01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0141.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0141.pdf |