WY HB0140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; reducing the waiting period for expungement of nonviolent felony convictions to expedite individuals' restoration of rights; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Expungement for restoration of rights-2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0140 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0140.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0140.pdf |