WY HB0140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health and public safety; requiring physicians to wait a specified period of time before performing certain nonemergency abortion procedures; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Abortion-48 hour waiting period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |