WY HB0139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation; increasing the time limit for review and redetermination of benefit claims and charges as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment compensation protests-time limit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0058 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0058 |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0058 |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0058 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | COW Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | COW Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |