WY HB0139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways, designating the "Wyoming Veterans Memorial Highway" as specified; requiring signage; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Veterans Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Blikre [R] | Rep. Dave Bonner [R] | Rep. Jonathan Botten [R] | Rep. Charles Childers [R] |
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] | Rep. James Petersen [R] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-02 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-24 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0052 | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-11 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-08 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-31 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-28 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |