WY HB0137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the submittal of an application for any proposed land exchange to the board of land commissioners as specified; requiring the board to provide public notice for any proposed land exchange; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State land exchanges-public notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0042 | |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2022-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0042 | |
2022-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-04 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-25 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 60-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |