WY HB0137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to welfare; repealing the Medicaid Fairness Act and related provisions; providing for the continuation of actions, rights and obligations as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid birth cost recovery-repeal.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] |
Sen. Affie Ellis [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-08 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-22 | Bill Number Assigned |